EP0197845 - Method of assembling surfaces by applying a polyurethane or polyether amide joint, superficially melting this joint and cooling it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states ATOCHEM 4 & 8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boutillier, Jacques Carsix F-27300 Bernay / FR | 02 /
Dehay, Georges Bois du Chene Glisolles F-27190 Conches en Ouche / FR | 03 /
Forichon, Noelle Residence Clairval Chemin de la Planquette F-27300 Bernay / FR | 04 /
Leroux, Roland 13, Rue du Coteau F-92370 Chaville / FR | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1986/42] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400659.8 | 27.03.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | FR19850004740 | 29.03.1985 Original published format: FR 8504740 | [1986/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197845 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197845 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/06, F16B11/00 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B29C45/14434 (EP);
C08J5/12 (KR);
B29C66/1142 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
B60J10/70 (EP);
C08G18/664 (EP);
C09J175/06 (EP);
C09J5/06 (EP,KR);
F16B11/006 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
C08G2170/20 (EP);
E06B3/96 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zusammenbringen von Oberflächen durch Auftrag einer Polyurethan- oder Polyetheramidfuge, oberflächiges Schmelzen dieser Fuge und Abkühlung derselben | [1986/42] | English: | Method of assembling surfaces by applying a polyurethane or polyether amide joint, superficially melting this joint and cooling it | [1986/42] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage de surfaces par application d'un joint en polyuréthane ou en polyétheramide, fusion superficielle de ce joint et refroidissement | [1989/03] |
Former [1986/42] | Procédé d'assemblage de surfaces par application d'un joint en polyuréthanne ou en polyétheramide, fusion superficielle de ce joint et refroidissement | Examination procedure | 24.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 05.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2321582 (NOVAGARD CORP [US]); | [A]GB2090607 (ATO CHIMIE); | [A]EP0081426 (BOUSSOIS SA [FR], et al); | [A]FR2534244 (BOUSSOIS SA [FR]) |