EP0198755 - Bus bar plug-in electronic module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CGEE ALSTHOM Direction RED Société Anonyme: 5, Avenue Newton 92140 Clamart / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states CGEE ALSTHOM Direction RED Société Anonyme: 5, Avenue Newton F-92140 Clamart / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrieux, Alain 4, rue des Rigoles F-78690 Les Essarts Le Roi / FR | 02 /
Trequilly, Yves 18 Bis, rue de Belgique F-92190 Meudon / FR | 03 /
Lavoine, Jean-Claude 29, rue Pasteur F-92120 Montrouge / FR | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1986/43] | Application number, filing date | 86400673.9 | 27.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | FR19850004978 | 02.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8504978 | [1986/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198755 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198755 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R25/14 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
H01R25/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/43] | Title | German: | Auf eine Sammelschiene einsteckbarer elektronischer Modul | [1986/43] | English: | Bus bar plug-in electronic module | [1986/43] | French: | Module électronique enfichable sur un connecteur bus | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/22] | 25.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2009516 (NOVUM AG); | [A]FR2269273 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0067757 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) |