EP0241620 - Hull shape of a surface-effect ship with side keels and two ways of navigating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETAT-FRANCAIS représenté par le DELEGUE GENERAL POUR L'ARMEMENT (DPAG) Bureau des Brevets et Inventions de la Délégation Générale pour l'Armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-75996 Paris Armées / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states ETAT-FRANCAIS représenté par le DELEGUE GENERAL POUR L'ARMEMENT (DPAG) Bureau des Brevets et Inventions de la Délégation Générale pour l'Armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-75996 Paris Armées / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balquet, Robert 35, rue Le Marois F-75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Baureau, Robert 10, Avenue Maximilien Robespierre F-94400 Vitry/Seine / FR | 03 /
Bertrand, Jean-Paul 15, Boulevard Exelmans F-75016 Paris / FR | 04 /
Guezou, Jean-Pierre Résidence les "Acacias" 11, Clos Pérault F-91200 Athis Mons / FR | 05 /
Carron, Philippe 2, square des Marguerites F-94000 Créteil / FR | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 86400817.2 | 16.04.1986 | [1987/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241620 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241620 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/12, B63B1/38, B60V3/06 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
B63B1/12 (EP);
B63B1/38 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Rumpfform für ein Bodeneffektschiff mit Seitenkielen für zwei Fahrweisen | [1987/43] | English: | Hull shape of a surface-effect ship with side keels and two ways of navigating | [1987/43] | French: | Formes de coque pour navire à effet de surface à quilles latérales à deux modes de navigation | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1986 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 21.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1210973 (HOVERMARINE LTD [GB]); | [A]US4506618 (CHAPLIN JOHN B [US]); | [A]GB1453184 (CORSON P F R); | [A]FR918390 ; | [A]DE2407498 (WESER AG); | [A]US3847103 (TAKEUCHI R) |