EP0210097 - Electrical push button switch with a buckling return membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAEGER 2, rue Baudin F-92303 Levallois-Perret / FR | [1989/40] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states D A V Vétraz-Monthoux F-74101 Annemasse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moury, Philippe Le Stade Sous Lachat F-74250 Viuz-en-Sallaz / FR | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Levy, David, et al c/o S.A. Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Levy, David, et al c/o S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/05] | Loriot, Jacques c/o SA. FEDIT-LORIOT 38, avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401419.6 | 27.06.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | FR19850010147 | 03.07.1985 Original published format: FR 8510147 | [1987/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210097 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210097 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/50 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
H01H13/50 (EP);
H01H13/702 (EP);
H01H2215/004 (EP);
H01H2215/006 (EP);
H01H2217/02 (EP);
H01H2221/046 (EP);
H01H2227/022 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1987/05] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Druckknopfschalter mit schnappender Rückstellmembran | [1987/05] | English: | Electrical push button switch with a buckling return membrane | [1987/05] | French: | Commutateur électrique à bouton-poussoir à membrane de rappel cloquante | [1987/05] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 08.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.04.1990 | [1990/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3333685 ; | [Y]DE8302660U ; | [A]DE3228241 ; | [A]GB2078009 ; | [A]GB2039417 ; | [A]DE3307659 |