EP0210891 - Method and apparatus for casting endless strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-Chome Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi Hyogo-Ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION 1-28, Kitahonmachi-dori 1-Chome Chuo-Ku, Kobe-Shi Hyogo-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoyama, Seiji 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakato, Hakaru 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Nozaki, Tsutomu 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Habu, Yasuhiro 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Bessho, Nagayasu 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Fujii, Tetsuya 1, Kawasaki-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Nony, Michel, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | Nony, Michel, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/06] | Nony, Michel NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401432.9 | 27.06.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | JP19850096576 | 27.06.1985 Original published format: JP 9657685 | JP19850189965 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: JP 18996585 | JP19860084234 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8423486 | JP19860086204 | 16.04.1986 Original published format: JP 8620486 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210891 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210891 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210891 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
B22D11/0605 (EP,US);
B22D11/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1987/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Giessen von endlosen Blechbändern | [1987/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for casting endless strip | [1987/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la coulée d'une bande continue | [1987/06] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1991 | BE | 27.12.1991 | CH | 27.12.1991 | LI | 27.12.1991 | [1992/46] |
Former [1992/37] | BE | 27.12.1991 | |
CH | 27.12.1991 | ||
LI | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 27.12.1991 | |
LI | 27.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59104256 ; | [A]JP5668569 ; | [AP]JP60261649 ; | [X]EP0092844 (HAZELETT STRIP CASTING CORP [US]); | [A]DE3207091 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2237508 (SCHLOEMANN AG) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 220 (M-330)[1657], 6th October 1984; & JP-A-59 104 256 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 16-06-1984, & JP59104256 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 131 (M-84)[803], 21st August 1981; & JP-A-56 68 569 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO K.K.) 09-06-1981, & JP5668569 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 138 (M-480)[2195], 21st May 1986; & JP-A-60 261 649 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 24-12-1985, & JP60261649 A 00000000 |