EP0217684 - Process for measuring flow and determining the parameters of multilayer hydrocarbon-producing formations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOPETROL SERVICES, INC. 8, Aquilino de la Guardia Panama City / PA | [1987/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehlig-Economides, Christine 44, rue de Courbuisson F-77920 Samois sur Seine / FR | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401653.0 | 23.07.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | FR19850011260 | 23.07.1985 Original published format: FR 8511260 | FR19850011261 | 23.07.1985 Original published format: FR 8511261 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0217684 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217684 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/10, E21B47/06, E21B49/00, E21B49/08 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
E21B49/0875 (EP,US);
E21B47/06 (EP,US);
E21B47/10 (EP,US);
E21B49/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung des Durchflusses und zur Bestimmung der Eigenschaften von Formationen mit verschiedenen Kohlenwasserstoff führenden Schichten | [1987/15] | English: | Process for measuring flow and determining the parameters of multilayer hydrocarbon-producing formations | [1987/15] | French: | Procédé de mesure de débit et de détermination des parametres des formations à plusieurs couches productrices d'hydrocarbures | [1987/15] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 01.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 15.11.1989 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.01.1990 | Appeal received No. T0337/90 | 13.03.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.11.1992 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1992/46] | 28.11.1992 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/48] | 16.12.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.09.1993 | NL | 15.09.1993 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 15.09.1993 | |
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 15.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2101037 (SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION); | [X]FR2238836 (SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION [FR]); | [Y]US4015194 (EPLING KAROL E); | [X]FR2434923 (SCHLUMBERGER PROSPECTION); | [AD]US4328705 (GRINGARTEN ALAIN C); | [YD]FR2544790 (FLOPETROL [FR]); | [XP]EP0176410 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) | [A] - PETROLEUM ENGINEER INTERNATIONAL, vol. 51, no. 7, June 1979, pages 129,130, Dallas, Texas, US; E.H. TIMMERMAN: "Various methods used to average permeability" |