EP0213030 - Process for making soils impervious and products for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLETANCHE Société Anonyme dite: 6 rue de Watford 92005 Nanterre / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states SOLETANCHE Société Anonyme dite: 6 rue de Watford F-92005 Nanterre / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gouvenot, Daniel 1, Allée Gambetta F-92110 Clichy / FR | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Geismar, Thierry, et al Cabinet Nony 29 Rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Geismar, Thierry, et al Cabinet Nony 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/10] | Nony, Michel NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401735.5 | 01.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | FR19850011773 | 01.08.1985 Original published format: FR 8511773 | [1987/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213030 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213030 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/00, C04B41/65, C04B28/26, // (C04B28/26, 22:06),(C04B28/26, 22:10) | [1987/10] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B20/0076 (EP,US);
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
C04B41/5089 (EP,US);
C04B41/68 (EP,US);
C09K17/12 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00732 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/0076, C04B20/02 (US,EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/28, C04B20/02 (US,EP);
C04B28/26, C04B20/02, C04B20/061 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B14/361 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B28/26 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Undurchlässigmachen von Böden und Produkte zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1987/10] | English: | Process for making soils impervious and products for carrying out this process | [1987/10] | French: | Procédé pour l'étanchéification des sols et produits pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1990/39] |
Former [1987/10] | Procédé pour L'étanchéification des sols et produits pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | Examination procedure | 30.04.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 12.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL291298 ; | [Y]FR1347791 (NOBEL BOZEL); | [A]FR1479181 ; | [A]US3908388 (DEVRIES FREDERICK WILLIAM); | [A]US4293097 (LEWIS HERBERT I, et al); | [A]DE3218271 (TATABANYAI SZENBANYAK [HU]); | [Y]FR2528441 (SOLETANCHE [FR]) |