Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] |
03.03.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] |
21.03.1989 | First examination report | |
16.06.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] |
11.02.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 30.03.1988 [1988/13] |
28.02.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.04.1987 [1987/16] |