Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE52138T | 15.05.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86401760 | 05.08.1986 | FR8511948 | 05.08.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0218489 | Global Dossier | 18.04.1990 | B1 | EP0218489 | 30.03.1988 | A3 | EP0218489 | 15.04.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR8511948 | 05.08.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3670534D1 | 23.05.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8511948 | 05.08.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2585818 | 09.10.1987 | B1 | FR2585818 | 06.02.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8511948 | 05.08.1985 |