EP0218489 - Large calibre double-barrel breakdown gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richert, Pierre 18 rue Général Gouraud F-57158 Montigny les Metz / FR | [1987/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86401760.3 | 05.08.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | FR19850011948 | 05.08.1985 Original published format: FR 8511948 | [1987/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218489 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218489 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218489 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F41A3/58, F41C7/00 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
F41A19/54 (EP);
F41A19/13 (EP);
F41A19/18 (EP);
F41C7/11 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/16] | F41C11/10, F41C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/16] | Title | German: | Doppelläufige Kipplaufwaffe grossen Kalibers | [1987/16] | English: | Large calibre double-barrel breakdown gun | [1987/16] | French: | Arme à feu à bascule à double canon de gros calibre | [1987/16] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 23.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE547498 [ ] (BRITTE SA ETS); | US2577335 [ ] (MARGUERITE LAMBERT VICTORINE M) | Examination | - "ENCYCLOPEDIE VAN WAPEN", Uitgeverij Helmond B.V., 1981, p. 134 |