blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0215717

EP0215717 - Method of producing a flame holder of composite material and flame holder produced according to this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.1989
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.1989 [1989/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2 Boulevard Victor
F-75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/13]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2 Boulevard Victor
F-75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Jourdain, Gérard Ernest André
4, Résidence l'Arcadie
Saintry S/Seine F-91100-Corbeil Essonnes / FR
02 / Marlin, François Marie Paul
64, Bd Aristide Briand
F-77000 - Melun / FR
[1987/13]
Representative(s)Moinat, François
S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81
91003 Evry Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/13]Moinat, François
S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81
F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date86402027.617.09.1986
[1987/13]
Priority number, dateFR1985001379418.09.1985         Original published format: FR 8513794
[1987/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0215717
Date:25.03.1987
Language:FR
[1987/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0215717
Date:14.12.1988
Language:FR
[1988/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:F23R3/00, F23R3/18, B29C67/18
[1987/13]
CPC:
F02F7/0087 (EP,US); B29C70/86 (EP,US); F23R3/007 (EP,US);
F23R3/18 (EP,US); F05C2253/16 (EP,US); Y10S29/025 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49346 (EP,US); Y10T29/49801 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1987/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flammenhalters aus Verbundkörpern und auf diese Weise hergestellter Flammenhalter[1987/13]
English:Method of producing a flame holder of composite material and flame holder produced according to this method[1987/13]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un anneau brûleur en matériau composite et anneau bruleur réalisé suivant ledit procédé[1987/13]
Examination procedure04.10.1986Examination requested  [1987/13]
26.02.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.03.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.1988Fee for grant paid
02.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2964907  (BRIAN TOONE);
 [A]GB2024403  (SNECMA);
 [A]US4278485  (HAMM ROBERT A, et al);
 [A]GB2107630  (GEN ELECTRIC)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.