EP0219396 - Pneumatic servo motor for assisted braking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENDIX France 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | [1987/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thioux, Alain 9 Allée des Bordes F-94430 Chennevières / FR | 02 /
Carre, Jean-Jacques 59, Bv. de l'Est F-93340 Le Raincy / FR | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1988/14] | Timoney, Ian Charles Craig Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1987/17] | Poidatz, Emmanuel Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402050.8 | 18.09.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | FR19850014452 | 30.09.1985 Original published format: FR 8514452 | [1987/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219396 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219396 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/24 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
B60T13/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1987/17] | Title | German: | Pneumatischer Bremskraftverstärker | [1987/17] | English: | Pneumatic servo motor for assisted braking | [1987/17] | French: | Servomoteur pneumatique d'assistance au freinage | [1987/17] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 10.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2561599 (DBA [FR]); | [A]GB2084274 (NISSHIN KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JPS5335661Y |