EP0216706 - Apparatus and process to measure the bubble point of petroleum from an underground formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOPETROL SERVICES, INC. 8, Aquilino de la Guardia Panama City / PA | [1987/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glotin, Bernard J.P. 78, avenue du Bois Guimier F-94000 Saint-Maur / FR | 02 /
Exbrayat, Jacques 19, rue Rosa Bonheur F-77000 Melun / FR | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Hagel, Francis, et al Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Hagel, Francis, et al Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1987/14] | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402077.1 | 23.09.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | FR19850014060 | 23.09.1985 Original published format: FR 8514060 | [1987/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0216706 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216706 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N7/00 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/28 (EP,US);
E21B49/08 (EP,US);
E21B49/082 (EP,US);
E21B49/0875 (EP,US);
G01N7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung des Brodelpunktes von Petroleum in einer unterirdischen Schicht | [1987/14] | English: | Apparatus and process to measure the bubble point of petroleum from an underground formation | [1987/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure du point de bulle du pétrole d'une formation souterraine | [1987/14] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.05.1992 | NL | 13.05.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.05.1992 | |
NL | 13.05.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | NL | 13.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2476205 (INST NEFTEPROMYSLOVOI GEOFIZ [SU]); | [A]FR2480941 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]FR2474196 (ARMINES [FR]); | [A]US2138141 (SYLVAN CROMER, et al); | [A]GB1601997 (NAT RES DEV) |