EP0217718 - Nonvolatile memory circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/15] | Improved nonvolatile storage cell | ||
[1992/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton, TX 75006-5039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS, INC. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | ||
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states THOMSON COMPONENTS-MOSTEK CORPORATION 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leuschner, Horst THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19 avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1987/15] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402196.9 | 03.10.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | US19850783493 | 03.10.1985 Original published format: US 783493 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217718 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217718 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217718 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/00, G11C11/00 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
G11C16/30 (EP,US);
G11C17/00 (KR);
G11C14/00 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/18] | G11C17/00, G11C11/00 | ||
Former IPC [1987/15] | G11C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/15] | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtiger Speicher | [1992/30] | English: | Nonvolatile memory circuit | [1992/30] | French: | Mémoire non-volatile | [1992/30] |
Former [1987/15] | Nichtflüchtige Speicherzelle | ||
Former [1987/15] | Improved nonvolatile storage cell | ||
Former [1987/15] | Cellule de mémoire non-volatile | Examination procedure | 19.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.1992 | NL | 22.07.1992 | [1993/15] |
Former [1993/14] | NL | 22.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2028615 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4393481 (OWEN WILLIAM H, et al); | [A]US4408303 (GUTERMAN DANIEL C [US], et al); | [A]EP0144637 (IBM [US]) |