EP0221808 - Shoe, in particular for skiing practice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1990 [1990/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Porcher, Pierre-Olivier 10 rue de docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states Porcher, Pierre-Olivier 10 rue de docteur Lancereaux F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402258.7 | 10.10.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | FR19850015085 | 11.10.1985 Original published format: FR 8515085 | [1987/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221808 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221808 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
A43B5/0407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1987/20] | Title | German: | Schuh, insbesondere für Skipraktik | [1987/20] | English: | Shoe, in particular for skiing practice | [1987/20] | French: | Chaussure, notamment pour la pratique du ski | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 23.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3410004 (FINN JAMES T); | [A]DE1901606 (WINTERSBERGER LUTZ); | [A]FR2098148 (RUDY M F); | [A]DE8117283U |