EP0220120 - Method for producing a charge transport device, and charge transport device manufactured thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanchard, Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Carquet, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Warenbourg, Philippe THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Mayeux, Michèle, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 92045 Paris la Défense Cedex 67 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Mayeux, Michèle, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI F-92045 PARIS LA DEFENSE CEDEX 67 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402263.7 | 10.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | FR19850015503 | 18.10.1985 Original published format: FR 8515503 | [1987/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220120 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220120 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/82, H01L21/28, H01L29/60 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
H01L29/66954 (EP,US);
H01L29/42396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1987/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Ladungstransportanordnung und danach hergestellte Ladungstransportanordnung | [1987/18] | English: | Method for producing a charge transport device, and charge transport device manufactured thereby | [1987/18] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un dispositif à transfert de charge, et dispositif à transfert de charge mettant en oeuvre ce procédé | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 06.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3795847 (ENGELER W, et al); | [A]US3943543 (CAYWOOD JOHN MILLARD); | [A]US4001861 (CARNES JAMES E); | [A]US4347656 (SMITH GEORGE E, et al) | [A] - SIEMENS FORSCHUNGS- UND ENTWICKLUNGSBERICHTE, vol. 4, no. 4, 1975, pages 226-230, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE; U. ABLASSMEIER et al.: "CCD-Schaltungen hoher Speicherdichte in Al-Si-Gate-Technologie" |