EP0222659 - Automatic slack adjuster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidmann, Kurt Richard Allied Corporation 401 N.Bendix Dr. P.O. Box 4001 South Bend, IN 46634 / US | 02 /
Wolfli, Clyde Roy Allied Corporation 401 N.Bendix Dr. P.O. Box 4001 South Bend, IN 46634 / US | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Turner, Alan Reginald BENDIX LIMITED Douglas Road Kingswood, Bristol BS15 2NL / GB | [1988/35] |
Former [1988/32] | Lejet, Christian BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1987/21] | Brullé, Jean Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402423.7 | 29.10.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | US19850797540 | 13.11.1985 Original published format: US 797540 | [1987/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0222659 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222659 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/60 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
F16D65/60 (EP);
F16D65/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/21] | Title | German: | Selbsttätige Spielnachstellvorrichtung | [1987/21] | English: | Automatic slack adjuster | [1987/21] | French: | Dispositif automatique de rattrapage de jeu | [1987/21] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/51] | 15.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4019612 (MATHEWS GEORGE P, et al); | [AD]US4380276 (SWEET ROGER, et al); | [AD]US3901357 (REITZ RICHARD J, et al); | [A]EP0145322 (CUMMING JAMES CHARLES); | [A]GB1025399 (BROMSREGULATOR SVENSKA AB); | [A]GB1091662 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL); | [A]EP0145947 (ALLIED CORP [US]); | [A]GB2123500 (AEROQUIP AG); | [A]EP0020128 (EATON CORP [US]) |