EP0223699 - Signal ground planes for tape bonded devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 10400 Ridgeview Court P.O. Box 1500 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 10400 Ridgeview Court P.O. Box 1500 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | ||
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states FAIRCHILD SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 10400 Ridgeview Court P.O. Box 1500 Cupertino California 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phy, William S. 25616 Moody Road Los Altos Hills California 94002 / US | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1988/34] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | ||
Former [1987/22] | Monod, Jean-Yves SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED 12 Place des Etats-Unis F-92124 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402501.0 | 12.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | US19850797283 | 12.11.1985 Original published format: US 797283 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0223699 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0223699 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, H01L23/50 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
H01L23/5387 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/22] | Title | German: | Signal- und Masseflächen für Bandmontage-Anordnungen | [1987/22] | English: | Signal ground planes for tape bonded devices | [1987/22] | French: | Plans de signaux et de masse pour dispositifs à montage sur bande | [1987/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 27.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/50] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/50] | 18.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/45] | Request for further processing for: | 11.12.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request rejected | 23.05.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58018949 ; | [Y]JP59222949 ; | [A]JP60037753 ; | [A]JP59152656 ; | [A]EP0072673 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 97 (E-171)[1239], 20th April 1983; & JP-A-58 018 949 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 03-02-1983, & JP58018949 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 95 (E-310)[1818], 24th April 1985; & JP-A-59 222 949 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 14-12-1984, & JP59222949 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 159 (E-326)[1882], 4th July 1985; & JP-A-60 037 753 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 27-02-1985, & JP60037753 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 285 (E-287)[1722], 26th December 1984; & JP-A-59 152 656 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 31-08-1984, & JP59152656 A 00000000 |