EP0236641 - Isolator for a metal-clad high tension installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN Rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kieffer, Jean MERLIN GERIN Rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Kern, Paul, et al Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze 38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Kern, Paul, et al Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402681.0 | 03.12.1986 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | FR19850019216 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: FR 8519216 | [1987/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236641 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236641 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/24 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
H01H33/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Trennschalter einer metallgekapselten Hochspannungsanlage | [1987/38] | English: | Isolator for a metal-clad high tension installation | [1987/38] | French: | Sectionneur d'isolement d'une installation blindée haute tension | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 28.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.1992 | GB | 11.03.1992 | IT | 11.03.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
GB | 11.03.1992 | ||
IT | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
GB | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 11.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE744144 (CONST ELECTR DE DELLE SA ATEL); | [Y]US4236053 (ASAI YOSHIHITO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0040781 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2558301 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) |