EP0231702 - Method and apparatus for certifying services obtained by the use of a portable medium such as a memory-card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.09.1993 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL CP8 Rue Eugène Hénaff BP 45 78190 Trappes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states BULL CP8 Rue Eugène Hénaff BP 45 F-78190 Trappes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chemin, François 10 rue Auguste Rodin F-78000 Plaisir / FR | 02 /
Ugon, Michel 6 rue des Cépages F-78310 Maurepas / FR | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Corlu, Bernard Edouard, et al CP8 Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 36-38 rue de la Princesse BP 45 78431 Louveciennes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Corlu, Bernard Edouard, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1992/11] | Siloret, Patrick Bull S.A. Industrial Property Department P.C.: HQ 8M006 B.P. 193.16 121,Avenue de Malakoff F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/30] | Debay, Yves BULL S.A. Tour BULL Cédex 74 PC/TB2803 F-92039 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [1987/33] | Debay, Yves BULL S.A. Industrial Property Department P.C.: HQ 8M006 B.P. 193.16 121 avenue de Malakoff F-75764 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86402893.1 | 22.12.1986 | [1987/33] | Priority number, date | FR19850019502 | 31.12.1985 Original published format: FR 8519502 | [1987/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231702 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231702 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4093 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
G07F7/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Bescheinigen von mittels eines tragbaren Mediums, wie einer Speicherkarte, erhaltenen Dienstleistungen | [1990/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for certifying services obtained by the use of a portable medium such as a memory-card | [1987/33] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour certifier des services obtenus à l'aide d'un support portatif tel qu'une carte à mémoire | [1987/33] |
Former [1987/33] | Verfahren und Gerät zum Bescheinigen der von einem tragbaren Medium, wie einer Speicherkarte, erhaltenen Dienstleistungen | Examination procedure | 11.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.1990
12.12.1990
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.1990
12.12.1990
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE | 09.01.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.07.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.07.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 31.05.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1994/04] | CH | 28.02.1990 | |
LI | 28.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0006498 (GREY LAB ESTABLISHMENT); | [A]EP0032193 (IBM [US]); | [A]FR2526977 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR], et al); | [A]EP0100260 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]EP0161181 (LOIRE SEREL ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SECURE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 22-23 février 1984, pages 1-4, The Institution of Electrical Engineers, Londres, GB; D.W. DAVIES: "Smart cards, digital signatures and negotiable documents" |