EP0197867 - Process for improving the purity of transition metals obtained by electrolysis of their halides in molten salts baths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1989 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY 23, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states PECHINEY 23, rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garnier, Jean-Pierre 1, rue de la Godardière F-27250 Rugles / FR | 02 /
Armand, Marcel 2, allée de la Roseraie F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Vanlaer, Marcel, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cédex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Vanlaer, Marcel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86420077.9 | 17.03.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | FR19850004596 | 19.03.1985 Original published format: FR 8504596 | [1986/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197867 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197867 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/26, C25C7/06 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
C25C3/26 (EP,US);
C25C7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Reinheit von Übergangsmetallen, die durch Elektrolyse aus ihren geschmolzenen Halogeniden gewonnen werden | [1986/42] | English: | Process for improving the purity of transition metals obtained by electrolysis of their halides in molten salts baths | [1986/42] | French: | Procédé d'amélioration de la pureté des métaux de transition obtenus par électrolyse de leurs halogénures en bain de sels fondus | [1986/42] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 14.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3082159 (REIMERT LAWRENCE J) |