EP0221827 - Device for the motorized opening and closing of a door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1990 [1990/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS LAUZIER 12 Route de Saint Jean F-38309 Bourgoin Jallieu Cédex Isère / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS LAUZIER 12 Route de Saint Jean F-38309 Bourgoin Jallieu Cédex Isère / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauzier, René Ruy F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU Le Britannia - Tour C 20, boulevard E. Déruelle F-69003 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 86420259.3 | 21.10.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | FR19850016320 | 25.10.1985 Original published format: FR 8516320 | FR19860014346 | 09.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8614346 | [1987/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221827 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221827 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/12 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
E05F15/41 (EP);
E05F15/614 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (EP);
E05Y2800/28 (EP);
E05Y2900/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | Motorisierte Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung der Öffnungs- und Schliessbewegungen eines Tores | [1987/20] | English: | Device for the motorized opening and closing of a door | [1987/20] | French: | Dispositif de commande motorisée pour l'ouverture et la fermeture d'un portail | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0015857 ; | [A]DE3121136 ; | [A]DE3219192 ; | [A]JPS5612482 ; | [A]US1386621 |