EP0271626 - Bypass mechanism for daisy chain connected units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billian, Auguste François Joseph 1246, av. de Provence F-06140 Vence / FR | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 86430052.0 | 16.12.1986 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271626 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271626 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/36 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
G06F13/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/25] | Title | German: | Umgehungsmechanismus für in "Daisy-Chain" geschalteten Einheiten | [1988/25] | English: | Bypass mechanism for daisy chain connected units | [1988/25] | French: | Mécanisme de contournement pour des unités connectées en "daisy chain" | [1988/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3806885 (MOORE B); | [X]GB2088598 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO); | [Y]US4584677 (KOSAKA TAKASHI [JP]) |