EP0200663 - Security device for windows which open selectively about a horizontal or a vertical axis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment Société à responsabilité limitée 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [1986/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prevot, Gérard 39, rue de Herbitzheim F-57430 Willerwald / FR | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 86440023.9 | 25.03.1986 | [1986/45] | Priority number, date | FR19850005415 | 09.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8505415 | [1986/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0200663 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0200663 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200663 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/526 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
E05D15/526 (EP);
E05D2015/5263 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/45] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Fenster, die sich in selektiver Weise um eine horizontale oder vertikale Achse öffnen | [1988/29] | English: | Security device for windows which open selectively about a horizontal or a vertical axis | [1986/45] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour fenêtres s'ouvrant sélectivement autour d'un axe horizontal ou vertical | [1986/45] |
Former [1986/45] | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Fenster die sich in selektiver Weise um eine horizontale oder vertikale Achse öffnen | Examination procedure | 24.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1385775 ; | [YD]DE2918274 (MAYER & CO RIEGEL BESCHLAG); | [A]DE3333702 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) |