EP0198784 - Fixed vane arrangement for a variable width diffuser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mulugeta, Jarso 205 Lansdowne Road DeWitt New York 13214 / US | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 86630038.7 | 06.03.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | US19850712057 | 15.03.1985 Original published format: US 712057 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198784 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/46, F04D27/02 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
F01D17/143 (EP);
F04D27/0246 (EP);
F04D29/444 (EP);
F04D29/462 (EP);
F04D29/464 (EP);
F05D2250/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/43] | Title | German: | Anordnung mit festen Schaufeln für Diffusor mit variablem Querschnitt | [1986/43] | English: | Fixed vane arrangement for a variable width diffuser | [1986/43] | French: | Ensemble de pales fixes pour diffuseur à section variable | [1986/43] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 02.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/34] | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2996996 ; | [A]US4378194 ; | [A]FR682818 |