EP0226528 - Ballcock float structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLUIDMASTER, Inc. 1800 Via Burton Anaheim California 92803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states FLUIDMASTER, Inc. 1800 Via Burton Anaheim California 92803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoepe, Adolf 1620 No. Raymond Avenue Fullerton California 92631 / US | 02 /
Dufau, Oscar R. 2400 Wildwood Fullerton California 92635 / US | 03 /
Siddiqui, Kabir 1717 E. Birch St. Apt. T-203 Brea California 92621 / US | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 86630182.3 | 01.12.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | US19850803310 | 02.12.1985 Original published format: US 803310 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226528 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226528 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226528 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16K33/00, E03D1/33 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
F16K33/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T137/7423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/26] | Title | German: | Schwimmerkonstruktion für Schwimmerhahn | [1987/26] | English: | Ballcock float structure | [1987/26] | French: | Construction de flotteur pour soupape à flotteur | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.1994 | CH | 09.02.1994 | GR | 09.02.1994 | LI | 09.02.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/47] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 09.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB862927 (ROYDON NELSON); | [A]US3428966 (SCHOEPE ADOLF, et al); | [A]DE2460091 (SCHOEPE ADOLF); | [A]DE2719478 (SCHOEPE ADOLF) |