EP0205396 - Resetting device for orbital welding sets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Franz Theresienstrasse 158 D-8000 München 2 / DE | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1986/51] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 86730062.6 | 04.04.1986 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | DE19850017844U | 14.06.1985 Original published format: DE 8517844 U | [1986/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0205396 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0205396 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205396 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/02 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
B23K9/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT, SE [1986/51] | Title | German: | Umrüstvorrichtung für Orbital-Schweissgeräte | [1986/51] | English: | Resetting device for orbital welding sets | [1986/51] | French: | Dispositif pour rajuster des postes de soudage orbitals | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 21.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1782461 (CHAPMAN VERNI J); | [A]US3132617 (MILLER KENNETH J, et al); | [A]DE2036528 ; | [A]GB1416853 (ESAB LTD) |