EP0221836 - Shift mechanism for a multi-zone ink ribbon in a matrix printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gomoll, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Mörickeweg 10 D-7916 Nersingen/Leibi / DE | 02 /
Hauslaib, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Robert-Koch-Strasse 16 D-7907 Langenau / DE | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1987/20] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 86730105.3 | 08.07.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | DE19853538761 | 31.10.1985 Original published format: DE 3538761 | [1987/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0221836 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0221836 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221836 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41J35/14 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
B41J35/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/20] | Title | German: | Drucker, insbes. Matrixdrucker, mit einer Umschalteinrichtung für ein Mehrzonenfarbband | [1987/20] | English: | Shift mechanism for a multi-zone ink ribbon in a matrix printer | [1987/20] | French: | Mécanisme de commutation pour ruban encreur multi-zones pour imprimante matricielle | [1987/20] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 07.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60145877 ; | [A]US3741364 (BECKER H); | [A]DE3301933 (TRIUMPH ADLER AG [DE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 17, Nr. 4, September 1974, Seiten 1118-1119, New York, US; H.L. CARPENTER: "Ribbon cartridge" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 311 (M-436)[2034], 7. Dezember 1985; & JP-A-60 145 877 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 01-08-1985, & JP60145877 A 00000000 |