EP0194232 - Curable composition containing an epoxy resin, an imidazolide and a polysulfonic resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Rolf, Dr. Buhnenstock 14 CH-3150 Schwarzenburg / CH | 02 /
Stauffer, Werner Av. Jean-Marie Musy 6 CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | 03 /
Bosshard, Christian, Dr. Schauenburgerstrasse 16 A CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH | 04 /
Fischer, Michael, Dr. Allmendstrasse CH-1712 Tafers / CH | [1986/37] | Application number, filing date | 86810106.4 | 03.03.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | CH19850001023 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: CH 102385 | [1986/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194232 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194232 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194232 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/00, C08G59/54, // C08J5/24, C09J7/00 ,(C08L63/00, 81:06) | [1986/37] | CPC: |
C08G59/4042 (EP);
C08L63/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L81/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/37] | Title | German: | Härtbare Gemische enthaltend ein Epoxidharz, ein Imidazolid und ein Polysulfon | [1986/37] | English: | Curable composition containing an epoxy resin, an imidazolide and a polysulfonic resin | [1986/37] | French: | Composition durcissable contenant une résine époxyde, une imidazolide et une résine de polysulphone | [1986/37] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1986 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 13.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2052225 ; | [AD]EP0124482 ; | [AD]DE3327823 ; | [A]FR2518094 ; | [XP]EP0146498 |