EP0197007 - Apparatus for bundling elongated objects, in particular bars of wood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller, Hermann Dorfhalde 3 CH-8712 Stäfa / CH | [1986/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/41] | Representative(s) | Bosshard, Ernst Luchs & Partner Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bosshard, Ernst Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1986/41] | Bosshard, Ernst Schulhausstrasse 12 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86810140.3 | 25.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | CH19850001309 | 26.03.1985 Original published format: CH 130985 | [1986/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197007 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197007 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65B27/10 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
B65B27/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/41] | Title | German: | Bündelungsanlage für längliche Gegenstände, insbesondere Holzleisten | [1986/41] | English: | Apparatus for bundling elongated objects, in particular bars of wood | [1986/41] | French: | Dispositif à botteler des objets oblongs, en particulier des listeaux de bois | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 14.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3386371 (FARMER HAROLD L, et al); | [Y]DE1528012 (SOEDERHAMNS VERKSTAEDER AB); | [Y]DE2251208 (SCHDARSKE STROJIRNY A SLEVARNY); | [A]GB1355294 (TUBE PROD LTD); | [A]GB1358472 (NORBERGS MEKANISKA VERKSTAD AB); | [A]DE2740985 (KOCKUMS IND AB) | [A] - RABE, K.: "Grundlagen feinmechanischer Konstruktionen", Wittenberg-Lutherstadt 1942, Seiten 145,146 |