EP0206984 - Process and device for controlling the number of revolutions of the spindle of a gear-working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REISHAUER AG. Limmatstrasse 87 CH-8005 Zürich / CH | [1986/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rebsamen, Roland Dorfstrasse 16 CH-9535 Wilen / CH | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | White, William, et al Patentanwalts-Bureau Isler AG Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1986/52] | Application number, filing date | 86810216.1 | 16.05.1986 | [1986/52] | Priority number, date | CH19850002735 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: CH 273585 | [1986/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0206984 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0206984 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0206984 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05D13/62, G05B19/18, G05B13/02, B23F5/00 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/186 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34244 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49177 (EP,US);
Y10T409/102226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/52] | G05B19/21, G05B19/407 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Drehzahl einer Spindel einer Zahnradbearbeitungsmaschine | [1986/52] | English: | Process and device for controlling the number of revolutions of the spindle of a gear-working machine | [1986/52] | French: | Système et dispositif pour régler le nombre de tours d'un axe d'une machine outil à engrenage | [1986/52] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 04.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2744562 (REISHAUER AG); | [Y]DE2441192 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ); | [A]DE1267315 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]EP0140831 (MAAG ZAHNRAEDER & MASCHINEN AG [CH]); | [AD]DE2724664 ; | [AD]DE2724602 | [Y] - DEUTSCHE ELEKTROTECHNIK | [A] - INSPEC PATENT ASSOCIATED LITERATURE | [A] - TZ FUER PRAKT. METALLBEARB. | Examination | - TZ FUER PRAKT. METALLBEARB. Heft 9, 70(1976), Seiten 287-289; H.J. KLUGE u.a.: "Elektronische Zwangslaufeinrichtung für Verzahnmaschinen" | - DEUTSCHE ELEKTROTECHNIK 10. Jahrgang, Heft 3, März 1956, DE, Seiten 23, 24; W. HORNAUER: "Die automatisierte Fabrik" | - INSPEC PATENT ASSOCIATED LITERATURE J252-7502-N, Band 20, Nr. 7, Juli 1984, Seite 374, Zusammenfassung vom "Journal of the institution of electronics and telecommunication engineers"; H.S. RAINA: "A new type of sample & hold circuit" |