EP0246388 - Briquetting press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holzmag Holzmaschinen AG Venedigstrasse 25 4023 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states Holzmag Holzmaschinen AG Venedigstrasse 25 CH-4023 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Päper, Bernd Rheintalweg 87 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1987/48] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | Eder, Carl E., et al Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 CH-4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 86810306.0 | 10.07.1986 | [1987/48] | Priority number, date | CH19860002078 | 22.05.1986 Original published format: CH 207886 | [1987/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0246388 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0246388 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/02 | [1987/48] | CPC: |
B30B15/302 (EP);
B30B11/14 (EP);
B30B15/32 (EP);
B30B9/3078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1987/48] | Title | German: | Brikettierpresse | [1987/48] | English: | Briquetting press | [1987/48] | French: | Presse à briquettes | [1987/48] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/48] | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2653105 [ ] (VEZZANI SPA OFF); | DE2928111 [ ] (ETERNAL INVEST AG); | DE3038839 [ ] (STOECKEL KLAUS [DE]); | DE3333766 [ ] (RUF HANS); | DE3432414 [ ] (KIENAST GUENTER) |