EP0213082 - Substituted hydroxy-heterocyclyl-alkoxy phosphinyloxy trialkylaminium hydroxide inner salt oxides, processes for their preparation and their use as pharmaceuticals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houlihan, William J. 15 Raynold Road Mountain Lakes, N.J. 07046 / US | 02 /
Lee, Mark Leonard 84 Espanong Road Lake Hopatcong, N.J. 07849 / US | [1987/10] | Application number, filing date | 86810379.7 | 25.08.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | US19850771288 | 30.08.1985 Original published format: US 771288 | US19850792095 | 28.10.1985 Original published format: US 792095 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213082 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213082 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/10, C07F9/65, A61K31/675 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
C07F9/65515 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07F9/59 (EP);
C07F9/655345 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | Substituierte Hydroxy-heterocyclyl-alkoxy-phosphinyloxy-trialkylaminium-hydroxid-Innersalzoxyde, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | [1987/10] | English: | Substituted hydroxy-heterocyclyl-alkoxy phosphinyloxy trialkylaminium hydroxide inner salt oxides, processes for their preparation and their use as pharmaceuticals | [1987/10] | French: | Oxydes sels internes substitués d'hydroxy-hétérocyclyl-alcoxy phosphinyloxy trialkylaminium, procédés pour les préparer et leur utilisation comme produits pharmaceutiques | [1987/10] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 05.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1551060 ; | [Y]EP0050460 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0178261 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al); | [YP]EP0188384 (SANKYO CO [JP]) |