EP0220134 - Rotating hydraulic cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACED S.A. rue Malvoisin 9 CH-2900 Porrentruy / CH | [1987/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard SA Ingénieurs-Conseils ACP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard SA Ingénieurs-Conseils ACP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 86810456.3 | 16.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | CH19850004556 | 23.10.1985 Original published format: CH 455685 | [1987/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220134 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220134 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/30 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
B23B31/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | Drehender Hydraulikzylinder | [1987/18] | English: | Rotating hydraulic cylinder | [1987/18] | French: | Vérin hydraulique tournant | [1987/18] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 22.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.10.1990 | NL | 03.10.1990 | SE | 03.10.1990 | BE | 31.10.1990 | LU | 31.10.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/01] | GB | 03.10.1990 | |
NL | 03.10.1990 | ||
SE | 03.10.1990 | ||
BE | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/44] | GB | 03.10.1990 | |
NL | 03.10.1990 | ||
SE | 03.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/41] | GB | 03.10.1990 | |
SE | 03.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 03.10.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE733869 (FORKARDT PAUL KG); | [A]CH370621 (ZAHNSCHNEIDEMASCHINENFAB MODUL [DE]); | [Y]CH471328 (FORKARDT PAUL KG [DE]); | [A]DE2151742 (KIRST SCHAAF KONSTRUKTIONSBUER); | [A]FR2180425 (PRECISION INDUSTRIELLE [FR]); | [A]DE2417887 (PRECISION IND S A); | [A]DE2404801 (SCHIEDRUM HYDRAULIK GMBH & CO); | [Y]EP0102805 (PRATT INT LTD BURNERD [GB]) |