EP0220137 - Trisimides of allyl- or methallyl-substituted bicyclo[2.2.1]hept-5-ene-2,3-dicarboxylic-acid imides, and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vonlanthen, Christian La Verdure CH-1711 Ependes / CH | 02 /
Kramer, Andreas, Dr. Bundtels CH-3186 Düdingen / CH | 03 /
Renner, Alfred, Dr. Marcoup 2 CH-3286 Muntelier / CH | [1987/18] | Application number, filing date | 86810465.4 | 20.10.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | CH19850004610 | 25.10.1985 Original published format: CH 461085 | [1987/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0220137 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0220137 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220137 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/76, C07F9/09, C07F9/145, C07F9/53, C08F26/06, C08F30/02, C08F22/40 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
C08F26/06 (EP,US);
C07D209/76 (EP,US);
C07F9/5537 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/18] | Title | German: | Trisimide von allyl- oder methallyl-substituierten Bicyclo[2.2.1]hept-5-en-2,3-dicarbonsäureimiden und deren Verwendung | [1987/18] | English: | Trisimides of allyl- or methallyl-substituted bicyclo[2.2.1]hept-5-ene-2,3-dicarboxylic-acid imides, and their use | [1987/18] | French: | Trisimides dérivés d'imides d'acides bicyclo[2.2.1] heptène-5 dicarboxyliques-2,3 substitués par le groupement allyle ou méthallyle et leur utilisation | [1987/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 29.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0152372 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0105024 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0134041 ; | [AD]DE2350472 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]EP0155435 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0146498 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |