EP0225288 - Apparatus for monitoring the thickness of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPEX CORPORATION Cherry Hill Industrial Center Building 42 Olney Avenue Cherry Hill New Jersey 08003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states OPEX CORPORATION Cherry Hill Industrial Center Building 42 Olney Avenue Cherry Hill New Jersey 08003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lile, William R. 122 Setauket Trail Medford Lakes New Jersey 08055 / US | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | White, William, et al PATENTANWALTS-BUREAU ISLER AG Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1987/24] | Application number, filing date | 86810537.0 | 25.11.1986 | [1987/24] | Priority number, date | US19850802690 | 27.11.1985 Original published format: US 802690 | [1987/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225288 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225288 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/16 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
B07C1/16 (EP);
B43M7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Dicke eines Objekts | [1987/24] | English: | Apparatus for monitoring the thickness of an object | [1987/24] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance de l'épaisseur d'un objet | [1987/24] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/20] | 23.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1506232 ; | [X]US4408487 ; | [X]WO8201698 ; | [X]EP0025976 ; | [Y]US4353197 ; | [A]US3712468 ; | [A]US2891667 ; | [ED]EP0169145 | [A] - MESSEN + PR]FEN, vol. 19, no. 9, September 1983, pages 483-485Bad Wörishofen; R. KR[MER "Mikroprozessorgesteuerter Zylinderkopf-Prüfautomat-Kernstück einer modernen Qualitätssicherung" |