EP0193497 - Hopper car with multiple bins having separate discharge drives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.p.A. CASSEFORME METALLICHE E AFFINI S.A.C.M.A. Via XX Settembre, 24 I-20123 Milano / IT | For all designated states SAEM S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Saliceto, 8 Roma / IT | [1986/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miniotto, Pietro c/o S.A.C.M.A. Via XX Settembre, 24 Milano / IT | 02 /
Rendo, Ugo c/o SAEM Via Guglielmo Saliceto, 8 Roma / IT | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Raimondi, Alfredo, et al Studio Tecnico Consulenza Brevetti Piazzale Cadorna 15 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Raimondi, Alfredo, Dott. Ing. Prof., et al Studio Tecnico Consulenza Brevetti Piazzale Cadorna 15 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86830029.4 | 11.02.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | IT19850019475 | 12.02.1985 Original published format: IT 1947585 | [1986/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193497 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193497 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193497 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61D7/26 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
B61D7/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/36] | Title | German: | Eisenbahn-Trichterwagen mit mehreren Behältern mit je einer Entladevorrichtung | [1986/36] | English: | Hopper car with multiple bins having separate discharge drives | [1986/36] | French: | Wagon à déchargement par gravité à plusieurs compartiments ayant chacun leur mécanisme de déchargement | [1986/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 28.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.1991 | BE | 28.02.1991 | CH | 28.02.1991 | LI | 28.02.1991 | [1992/30] |
Former [1992/29] | AT | 11.02.1991 | |
CH | 28.02.1991 | ||
LI | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/07] | CH | 28.02.1991 | |
LI | 28.02.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE160913 ; | [A]FR529809 ; | [A]DE491984 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH WERKE AG); | [A]US3587475 (DAMY EDUARDO M, et al); | [A]FR2289381 (WAGGON UNION GMBH [DE]) | Examination | IT1161127 |