EP0211809 - A structure, adjustable in extension by means of an inner closed-circuit hydraulic device, particularly suitable as vertical rod structure for the seat rest of a chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.1988 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRO-CORD s.r.l. Via Pratello n. 9 40122 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states PRO-CORD s.r.l. Via Pratello n. 9 I-40122 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piretti, Giancarlo Piazza Trento e Trieste n. 2/2 I-Bologna / IT | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Coppi, Cecilia Via Oblach No. 1 40141 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Coppi, Cecilia Via Oblach No. 1 I-40141 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 86830151.6 | 05.06.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | IT19850003462 | 11.06.1985 Original published format: IT 346285 | [1987/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0211809 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0211809 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/30 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
A47C3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | Längenverstellbare Struktur, mittels einer hydraulischen Vorrichtung mit innerem geschlossenem Kreis, insbesondere eine vertikale Säulenstruktur für die Sitzstütze eines Stuhles | [1987/09] | English: | A structure, adjustable in extension by means of an inner closed-circuit hydraulic device, particularly suitable as vertical rod structure for the seat rest of a chair | [1987/09] | French: | Structure réglable en longueur au moyen d'un dispositif hydraulique à circuit fermé interne, notamment une structure de colonne verticale d'un support de siège d'une chaise | [1987/09] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 25.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/36] | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   26.08.1986 | 07.07.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   26.08.1986 | 07.07.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   26.08.1986 | 07.07.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   26.08.1986 | 07.07.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   26.08.1986 | 07.07.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   26.08.1986 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.01.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3322796 (HANSEN ECKARD) |