EP0217760 - An electrical switch having a sealing element, particularly designed for window winders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAVIS CAVETTI ISOLATI S.p.A. Via Roma, 31 I-15023 Felizzano (Alessandria) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states CAVIS CAVETTI ISOLATI S.p.A. Via Roma, 31 I-15023 Felizzano (Alessandria) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Codrino, Giuseppe Via Stazione 2 I-15028 Quattordio (Alessandria) / IT | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86830266.2 | 01.10.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | IT19850023321U | 03.10.1985 Original published format: IT 2332185 U | [1987/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217760 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217760 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01H23/06 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
H01H23/06 (EP);
H01H2009/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1987/15] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schalter mit Abdichtungselement, insbesondere geeignet für Scheibenhebevorrichtungen | [1987/15] | English: | An electrical switch having a sealing element, particularly designed for window winders | [1987/15] | French: | Interrupteur électrique avec élément d'étanchéité adapté en particulier aux installations de remontage de vitres | [1987/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1989 | New documents discovered [1989/24] | 13.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 25.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3668938 ; | [Y]US3483345 ; | [A]EP0122465 ; | [A]EP0060686 ; | [A]US3265826 |