EP0232685 - Adjustment device for motor vehicle seats [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rovero, Giuseppe Corso Giovanni Agnelli 119 I-10134 Torino / IT | 02 /
Stacchino, Giuseppe Via Tiepolo 10 I-10024 Moncalieri (Torino) / IT | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 86830383.5 | 29.12.1986 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | IT19860067028 | 14.01.1986 Original published format: IT 6702886 | [1987/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232685 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232685 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60N1/02 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
B60N2/067 (EP);
B60N2/0284 (EP);
B60N2/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Einstellvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeugsitze | [1987/34] | English: | Adjustment device for motor vehicle seats | [1987/34] | French: | Dispositif de réglage pour sièges de véhicules automobiles | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2555804 (MCCARTHY CHARLES S); | [A]US2583349 (WIDMAN JOHN C, et al); | [A]GB884266 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]FR1462408 (PUBLICITE FRANCAISE); | [A]FR1460071 (RENAULT); | [A]US3295889 (LORENZ RUDOLF A); | [A]US3356413 (RADKE ARTHUR O, et al); | [A]FR2078927 (WINGARD LTD); | [A]EP0029997 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |