EP0203898 - Conveyor line for heavy goods conveying [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wahren, Per Erik Strandgatan 2 S-592 00 Vadstena / SE | [1986/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Slettengren, Anders Ingemar K., et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | Slettengren, Ingemar, et al Oscar Grahn Patentbyra AB Box 19540 S-104 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 86850159.4 | 30.04.1986 | [1986/49] | Priority number, date | SE19850002654 | 29.05.1985 Original published format: SE 8502654 | [1986/49] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203898 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203898 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203898 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65G19/02, B65G17/00, B65G17/32 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
B65G19/02 (EP,SE,US);
B65G35/08 (SE)
|
Former IPC [1986/49] | B65G19/02, B65G17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/29] |
Former [1986/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Förderstrecke für schwere Lasten | [1986/49] | English: | Conveyor line for heavy goods conveying | [1986/49] | French: | Ligne de transport pour charges lourdes | [1986/49] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 07.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1431667 (GREBE KONRAD); | [A]DE2431244 (MICAFIL AG); | [A]CH571997 (DAVERIO AG) | Examination | EP0163617 |