EP0261296 - Apparatus for laser-enhanced metal electroplating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laude, Lucien Diégo 64, Rue des Lilas F-59330 Hautmont / FR | [1991/24] |
Former [1988/42] | For all designated states Biernaux, Alain c/o LASER APPLICATIONS BELGIUM Société Anonyme Site du Grand-Hornu Rue Sainte Louise B-7320 Bousu / BE | ||
For all designated states Laude, Lucien Diégo 64, Rue des Lilas F-59330 Hautmont / FR | |||
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states Biernaux, Alain Université de l'Etat Faculté des Sciences (Prof. Laude) Avenue Maistriau 23 B-7000 Mons / BE | ||
For all designated states Laude, Lucien Diégo 64, Rue des Lilas F-59330 Hautmont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biernaux, Alain Rue de l'Enseignement, 32 B-7090 Braine-le-Comte / BE | 02 /
Laude, Lucien Diego 64, Rue des Lilas F-59330 Hautmont / FR | [1992/30] |
Former [1988/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Application number, filing date | 86870135.0 | 25.09.1986 | [1988/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261296 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261296 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
C25D5/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur laserunterstützten, elektrolytischen Metallabscheidung | [1988/13] | English: | Apparatus for laser-enhanced metal electroplating | [1988/13] | French: | Appareillage pour le dépôt électrolytique ponctuel assisté par laser de métaux sur des solides | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 27.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/09] | 24.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/28] | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/28] | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Request for further processing for: | 24.02.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.1992 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 25.02.1992 | Date of receipt | 05.05.1992 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.09.1987 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | 25.09.1987 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   29.12.1986 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.1989 | 02.10.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.1990 | 01.10.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.1991 | 30.09.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 22.07.1992 | GB | 22.07.1992 | IT | 22.07.1992 | NL | 22.07.1992 | SE | 22.07.1992 | BE | 30.09.1992 | CH | 30.09.1992 | LI | 30.09.1992 | [1999/42] |
Former [1993/46] | DE | 22.07.1992 | |
GB | 22.07.1992 | ||
NL | 22.07.1992 | ||
SE | 22.07.1992 | ||
BE | 30.09.1992 | ||
CH | 30.09.1992 | ||
LI | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/38] | DE | 22.07.1992 | |
NL | 22.07.1992 | ||
SE | 22.07.1992 | ||
BE | 30.09.1992 | ||
CH | 30.09.1992 | ||
LI | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | DE | 22.07.1992 | |
NL | 22.07.1992 | ||
SE | 22.07.1992 | ||
CH | 30.09.1992 | ||
LI | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | DE | 22.07.1992 | |
NL | 22.07.1992 | ||
SE | 22.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/14] | NL | 22.07.1992 | |
SE | 22.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/11] | SE | 22.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59129780 ; | [A]GB2154017 (GEN ELECTRIC) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 251 (C-252)[1688], 16th November 1984; & JP-A-59 129 780 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 26-07-1984, & JP59129780 A 00000000 |