EP0223765 - Process for the preparation of hydroxy-3 ketone derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI S.A. 40, Avenue George V 75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France 75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states SANOFI S.A. 40, Avenue George V F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France F-75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veschambre, Henri 33bis rue Cotepet F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
Bolte, Jean F-63117 Chauriat / FR | 03 /
Gourcy, Jean Gabriel 78bis avenue de la Gare F-63360 Gerzat / FR | 04 /
Pigerol, Charles 13, Parc du Béarn F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Cauchie, Daniel C/o S.A. LABAZ-SANOFI N.V. Avenue De Béjar, 1 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Cauchie, Daniel c/o S.A. LABAZ-SANOFI N.V. Avenue De Béjar, 1 B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 86870145.9 | 09.10.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | FR19850015103 | 11.10.1985 Original published format: FR 8515103 | [1987/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223765 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/17, C07C49/24, C12P7/02, C12P7/04, C12P7/26, C12R1/865 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
C07C49/17 (EP);
C07C49/24 (EP);
C12N1/185 (EP);
C12P7/26 (EP);
C12R2001/865 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxy-3-ketonderivaten | [1987/22] | English: | Process for the preparation of hydroxy-3 ketone derivatives | [1987/22] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés hydroxy-3 cetoniques | [1987/22] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/28] | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2060121 (SYNTEX CORP [PA]); | [YP]US4584193 (BURKHOLDER WENDELL E [US], et al); | [X]JPS54103811 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, 1980, page 545, résumé no. 93901g, Columbus, OhioUS; & JP-A-79 103 811 (TEIJIN LTD) 15-08-1979 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, 1978, page 548, résumé no. 42503j, Columbus, Ohio, US; R. LE GOALLER et al.: "Cyclopropanediols. VII. Chemical behavior of cyclopropanediols and reactions of 1,2-bis(trimethylsiloxy)cyclopropanes", & CAN. J. CHEM. 1978, 56(4)481-6 | [YD] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 25, no. 12, 1984, pages 1241-1244, Pergamon Press LtdGB; D.W. BROOKS et al.: "Chiral cyclohexanoid synthetic precursors via asymmetric microbial reduction of prochiral cyclohexaned iones" |