EP0203054 - Crank-gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeannée, Wolfgang Parkring 12a A-1010 Wien / AT | [1986/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Ernst Baumgasse 29-41/62/5 A-1030 Wien / AT | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Hamburger, Walter A. Patentanwaltskanzlei HAMBURGER Postfach 96 Mahlerstrasse 9 1015 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Hamburger, Walter A., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltskanzlei HAMBURGER Postfach 96 Mahlerstrasse 9 A-1015 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890105.9 | 15.04.1986 | [1986/48] | Priority number, date | AT19850001168 | 18.04.1985 Original published format: AT 116885 | [1986/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0203054 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0203054 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62M1/02 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
B62M1/36 (EP);
B62M1/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/48] | Title | German: | Tretkurbelgetriebe | [1986/48] | English: | Crank-gear | [1986/48] | French: | Pédalier | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/22] | 11.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR872462 ; | [A]BE377432 ; | [A]FR2516886 ; | [A]GB481838 ; | [A]GB415272 ; | [A]FR933930 |