EP0210973 - Push button key board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Siemensstrasse 88 - 92 1210 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Siemensstrasse 88 - 92 A-1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brabec Reinhard, Ing. Doppelng. 139 A-3400 Kierling / AT | 02 /
Formanek, Karl Simmeringer-Hauptstrasse 16 A-1110 Wien / AT | [1987/06] | Application number, filing date | 86890151.3 | 23.05.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | AT19850001778 | 14.06.1985 Original published format: AT 177885 | [1987/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210973 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
H01H13/702 (EP);
H01H2213/002 (EP);
H01H2213/01 (EP);
H01H2213/014 (EP);
H01H2221/05 (EP);
H01H2223/002 (EP);
H01H2223/034 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Tastwahlblock | [1987/06] | English: | Push button key board | [1987/06] | French: | Clavier à touches | [1987/06] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/26] | 22.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/36] | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.06.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.1986 | 23.06.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.1986 | 23.06.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3676607 ; | [Y]GB2144271 ; | [Y]FR2330074 ; | [A]DE3407380 ; | [A]US3995126 |