EP0209514 - Measuring device, in particular an opto-electronical incremental measuring device for lengths or angles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RSF-Elektronik Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-5121 Tarsdorf 93 / AT | [1990/20] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states RSF-Elektronik Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-5121 Tarsdorf 93 / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rieder, Heinz Riedersabach 90 A-5120 St. Pantaleon / AT | 02 /
Schwaiger, Max A-5120 Ostermiething 298 / AT | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890191.9 | 26.06.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | AT19850002036 | 10.07.1985 Original published format: AT 203685 | [1987/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209514 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209514 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209514 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/34 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
G01D5/34723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Messsystem, insbesondere inkrementales Messsystem für die Messung von Längen und Winkeln auf optoelektronischem Wege | [1987/04] | English: | Measuring device, in particular an opto-electronical incremental measuring device for lengths or angles | [1987/04] | French: | Dispositif de mesure, en particulier dispositif de mesure incrémental de longueurs et d'angles par voie opto-électronique | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58187810 ; | [A]JP60085317 ; | [A]JP60039507 ; | [X]GB1221974 (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD [GB]); | [XD]EP0076858 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 33 (P-254)[1470], 14. Februar 1984; & JP-A-58 187 810 (FUJITSU FANUC K.K.) 02-11-1983, & JP58187810 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 227 (P-388)[1950], 13. September 1985; & JP-A-60 085 317 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 14-05-1985, & JP60085317 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 163 (P-371)[1886], 9. Juli 1985; & JP-A-60 039 507 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 01-03-1985, & JP60039507 A 00000000 |