blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0234180

EP0234180 - Telescopic sight with automatic elevation adjustment by means of an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.1991
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.1991 [1991/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basta, Walter
Zanaschkagasse 12/29/3
A-1120 Wien / AT
[1987/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/36]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1990/34]
Former [1987/36]Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn.
Dorotheergasse 7/14
A-1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date86890349.318.12.1986
[1987/36]
Priority number, dateAT1985000366718.12.1985         Original published format: AT 366785
[1987/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0234180
Date:02.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.1987
ClassificationIPC:F41G1/38, G02B23/00
[1987/36]
CPC:
F41G1/38 (EP,US); G02B23/14 (EP,US); G02B27/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/36]
TitleGerman:Zielfernrohr mit automatischer Einstellung der Elevation durch E-Motor[1987/36]
English:Telescopic sight with automatic elevation adjustment by means of an electric motor[1987/36]
French:Appareil de visée téléscopique à réglage automatique d'élévation par moteur électrique[1987/36]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure25.02.1988Examination requested  [1988/16]
06.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.08.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/23]
08.01.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1991/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.198903   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.1989
02.01.199105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchDE498191  [ ] (HERMANN GERLICH);
 CH180989  [ ] (GOERZ OPTISCHE ANSTALT AG [CZ]);
 US3097432  [ ];
 DE1203975  [ ] (REDFIELD GUN SIGHT COMPANY);
 US3492733  [ ] (LEATHERWOOD JAMES M);
 DE2207323  [ ];
 US3782822  [ ] (SPENCE M)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.