Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE73498T | 15.03.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86900082 | 13.12.1985 | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | DK8500120 | 13.12.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE205506T | 21.05.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | DK8500120 | 13.12.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3585624D1 | 16.04.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | DK8500120 | 13.12.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK386186D0 | 13.08.1986 | D0 | DK386186 | 13.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | DK386186 | 13.08.1986 | DK8500120 | 13.12.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS62501885 | 30.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | DK8500120 | 13.12.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8603774 | Global Dossier | 03.07.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0205506 | Global Dossier | 11.03.1992 | B1 | EP0205506 | 30.12.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK601984D0 | 14.12.1984 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DK601984 | 14.12.1984 |