EP0207126 - SECURITY DEVICE FOR THE SECURE STORAGE OF SENSITIVE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.02.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1992 | Revocation of patent | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR CORPORATION World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | [1987/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIJNE, Theodoor, Adriaan Willem Alexanderstraat 17 NL-6621 ZA Breumel / NL | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 86900446.5 | 06.12.1985 | [1987/02] | WO1985US02412 | Priority number, date | US19840684637 | 21.12.1984 Original published format: US 684637 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603861 | Date: | 03.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207126 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207126 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
H01L23/576 (EP,US);
G06F21/87 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2143 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S257/922 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/02] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE SICHERE SPEICHERUNG EMPFINDLICHER DATEN | [1987/02] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE FOR THE SECURE STORAGE OF SENSITIVE DATA | [1987/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE POUR LE STOCKAGE SUR DE DONNEES CONFIDENTIELLES | [1987/02] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.1990
23.11.1990
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.1990
23.11.1990
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | 12.12.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.11.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3023427 [ ] (GRETAG AG); | WO8404614 [ ] (GALE IRA DENNIS [GB]) | [X] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Volume 23, No. 7A, December 1980, New York, (US) SCHREIBER: "Data and Program Secure Microprocessor System", pages 2960-2961, see page 2961, lines 1-2, 8-12 |