EP0209544 - GRAPHIC DESIGN ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSEN, Jeffrey, R. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133 / US | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900572.8 | 27.12.1985 | [1987/05] | WO1985US02571 | Priority number, date | US19850695693 | 28.01.1985 Original published format: US 695693 | [1987/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604303 | Date: | 31.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0209544 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209544 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17, G03C5/00 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
G03F7/34 (EP,US);
B44C1/10 (KR);
B44C1/1733 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24876 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2809 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/30] |
Former [1987/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | GRAFISCHES DESIGN-MATERIAL | [1987/05] | English: | GRAPHIC DESIGN ARTICLE | [1987/05] | French: | ARTICLE DE DECORATION GRAPHIQUE | [1987/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU | 21.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 27.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.10.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 29.10.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 29.10.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 29.10.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0094182 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | GB1233543 [ ]; | US4291114 [ ] (BERGGREN WILLIAM R, et al); | FR2313700 [ ] (DU PONT [US]); | FR2330033 [ ] (SEAL [US]); | EP0096572 [ ] (LETRASET INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) |